+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17 - Senate Journal #26
- To Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #13
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 403)
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
- Motion
- Referred to Finance
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- To Pensions
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 105)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To House Pensions and Retirement
- Introduced in House
- To Pensions and Retirement then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 8 - 22 - 20 - (Amended Code)