+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 158, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/21/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal #24
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 525)
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 457)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Finance Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Pensions Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- To Pensions then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 104)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To House Pensions and Retirement
- Introduced in House
- To Pensions and Retirement then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 8 - 22 - 27 a - (New Code)
- § 8 - 22 - 27 b - (New Code)