+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal #1635
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 345)
- Completed legislative action
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 113)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To House Pensions and Retirement
- Introduced in House
- To Pensions and Retirement then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- § 5 - 10 - 27 b - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 14 D- 9 b - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 22 A- 11 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 2 - 45 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 2 A- 6 b - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 V- 13 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 7 A- 28 b - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 7 B- 12 a - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 9 - 12 b - (Amended Code)