+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal #317
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal #285
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 397)
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
- To Finance
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 187)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §11 - 10 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 - 18 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: Passed Senate (Roll No. 397)
February 15, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 187)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor