+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- §18 - 21 A- 1 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 2 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 3 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 4 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 5 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 6 - (New Code)
- §18 - 21 A- 7 - (New Code)
- §19 - 12 E- 5 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 a - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 b - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 c - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 d - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 e - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 f - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 g - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 h - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 i - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 j - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 k - (New Code)
- § 5 F- 2 - 1 l - (New Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2015: Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 8)
March 10, 2015: House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 428)
February 28, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 13)
February 10, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 59)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor