+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 80)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 20 - 11 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 10, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 80)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor