+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 160)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 6 C- 2 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- § 6 C- 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)