+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 177, Acts, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/29/13
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal #3160
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal #43
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal #3148
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal #34
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 20)
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 457)
- Completed legislative action
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 27)
- Read 3rd time
- From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §47 - 9 - 44 - (Amended Code)
- §47 - 9 - 53 a - (New Code)
- §47 - 9 - 10 a - (New Code)