+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #22
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 534)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Effective ninety days from passage
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 456)
- Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 455)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 454)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment reported
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 429)
- Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 430)
- Floor amendment to amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Committee reference dispensed
- Immediate consideration
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 214)
- Passed House (Roll No. 213)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 205)
- Placed at foot of 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §18 - 9 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 7 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 A- 10 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 D- 4 d - (New Code)
+ − Votes (9)
April 8, 2017: Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 534)
April 7, 2017: Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 455)
April 7, 2017: Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 456)
April 7, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 454)
April 6, 2017: Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 429)
April 6, 2017: Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 430)
March 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 213)
March 28, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 214)
March 27, 2017: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 205)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor