+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 231, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/21/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal #24
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
- Communicated to Senate
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 521)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Floor Title amendment adopted
- Finance Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 399)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Laid over on 2nd reading 4/4/17
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 1st reading 4/1/17
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 112)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Industry and Labor
- Introduced in House
- To Industry and Labor then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §11 - 13 W- 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2017: Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 521)
April 6, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 399)
March 17, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 112)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor