+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 109)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- By substitute, do pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 8 C- 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
April 1, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 109)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor