+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Read 3rd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 453)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 4/5/17
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 111)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Industry and Labor
- Introduced in House
- To Industry and Labor then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §21 - 5 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §21 - 5 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 453)
March 17, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 111)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor