+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/10/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/10/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/10/17 - Senate Journal #13
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 343)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 369)
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 103)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- §30 - 7 F- 1 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 2 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 3 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 4 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 5 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 6 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 7 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 8 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 9 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 10 - (New Code)
- §30 - 7 F- 11 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 369)
April 4, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 343)
March 16, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 103)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor