+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal #1635
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 342)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- Passed House (Roll No. 368)
- Completed legislative action
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with title amendment
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 143)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 9 - 5 - 25 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 368)
April 4, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 342)
March 23, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 143)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor