+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 341)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 28, 2015 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in House
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §33 - 16 - 18 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 4, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 341)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor