+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - House Journal #1291
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/28/19 - Senate Journal #8
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/28/19
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/22/19 - Senate Journal #6
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 2/22/19 - House Journal #1119
- To Governor 2/22/19
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212)
- Completed legislative action
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 123)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 45)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 9 - 6 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §49 - 2 - 809 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2019: House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212)
February 12, 2019: Passed Senate (Roll No. 123)
January 30, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 45)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor