+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 151, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 658)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 396)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with title amendment
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 65)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in House
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §33 - 27 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 27 - 6 b - (New Code)
- §33 - 27 - 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2019: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 396)
February 1, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 65)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor