+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/13/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal #17
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 376)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Agriculture and Rural Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Agriculture and Rural Development then Government Organization
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 212)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §19 - 12 E- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 29 - 1 - (Amended Code)