+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/9/19
- To Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal #176
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 350)
- Completed legislative action
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 205)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Do pass, but first to Government Organization
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
- Introduced in House
- To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 8 - 15 - 8 b - (Amended Code)
- §12 - 4 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §12 - 4 - 14 b - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 - 5 f - (Amended Code)