+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #22
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 546)
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 545)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 452)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 452)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Read 1st time
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 256)
- Passed House (Roll No. 255)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
- Introduced in House
- To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §16 - 53 - 1 - (New Code)
- §16 - 53 - 2 - (New Code)
- §16 - 53 - 3 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 546)
April 7, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 452)
April 7, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 452)
March 29, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 256)
March 29, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 255)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor