+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 98, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/20
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Weld Title amendment adopted
- Deferred until foot of 3rd
- Committee Amendment Reported
- Trump Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Plymale Amendment to committee amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 572)
- Judiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 740)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal #575
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported by clerk
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20 with right to amend, amendment pending
- On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 54)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 51)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Statute Amended
- §62 - 1 C- 1 a - (Amended Code)