+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 12 - (Amended Code)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor