+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 90, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/20/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/13/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal #16
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 398)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 338)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 14)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Senior Citizen Issues
- Introduced in House
- To Senior Citizen Issues then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §36 - 1 - 20 - (Amended Code)
- §42 - 4 - 2 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 338)
February 23, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 14)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor