+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 254)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §17 E- 1 - 18 - (Amended Code)
- §17 E- 1 - 9 - (Amended Code)