+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 50, Acts, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/25/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal #3160
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal #43
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal #3142
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal #28
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 7)
- Communicated to House
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 15)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §17 C- 19 - 3 - (Amended Code)