+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/17 - Senate Journal #2
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/17 - House Journal #1056
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/17
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/17 - Senate Journal #7
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/17 - House Journal #0
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/17
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 161)
- Communicated to House
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 8)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- §33 - 15 - 4 o - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 - 3aa - (New Code)
- §33 - 24 - 7 p - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 - 8 m - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 A- 8 o - (New Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 18 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 161)
February 22, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 8)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor