+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal #1295
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal #10
- Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal #6
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/25/15
- To Governor 2/25/15
- To Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal #1190
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 35)
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 34)
- Read 3rd time
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Passed House (Roll No. 163)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 73)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- With amendment, do pass
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §25 - 1 - 5 a - (New Code)