+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (63)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/15 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/15
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/12/15 - Senate Journal #141
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/9/15
- To Governor 3/9/15 - House Journal #1874
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/9/15 - Senate Journal #71
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 2)
- Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 2)
- House Message received
- Vetoed by Governor 2/24/15 - Senate Journal #6
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House reconsidered its action
- Reported by the Clerk
- House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 219)
- Communicated to Senate
- Motion to recommitt bill to the committee on the Judiciary rejected
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 220)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 2/24/15 - House Journal #1271
- Vetoed by Governor 2/24/15
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/18/15 - Senate Journal #33
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 2/18/15
- To Governor 2/18/15 - House Journal #947
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 77)
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 76)
- House received Senate message
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 7)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7)
- Senate requests House to concur
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reformed Amendment reported
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 8)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Roll No 7)
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to Senate
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Amendments pending
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass
- Originating in House Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- §24 - 2 F- 8 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (10)
February 28, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 2)
February 28, 2015: Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 2)
February 26, 2015: House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 219)
February 26, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 220)
February 16, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 77)
February 16, 2015: House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 76)
February 13, 2015: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7)
February 13, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 7)
January 23, 2015: Amendment adopted (Roll No 7)
January 23, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 8)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor