+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/17/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/17/17 - Senate Journal #17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/17/17 - House Journal #0
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 394)
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 253)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 247)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Education
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
- Introduced in House
- To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 - 2 - 7 b - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 - 7 b - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 394)
March 29, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 253)
March 28, 2017: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 247)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor