+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 27)
- Passed House (Roll No. 26)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §18 - 9 D- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 D- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 D- 4 c - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 D- 16 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 9 D- 22 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 27)
February 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 26)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor