+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
- To Judiciary
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 133)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 134)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §37 - 6 - 31 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2015: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 133)
February 20, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 134)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor