+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 86)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §17 - 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §17 - 16 A- 6 a - (New Code)
- §16 - 4 C- 24 - (New Code)
- §16 - 4 C- 25 - (New Code)
- §30 - 1 - 7 a - (Amended Code)