+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations .
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor