+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- ENET - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)