+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- TR - Majority; do pass.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRAN - Majority; do pass.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor