+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TRED - Majority; do pass.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor