+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- TR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRAN - Majority; do pass.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
8001 AMH TR H2266.1
ADOPTED 04/15/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor