+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 119, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Environment.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (AWRD 16).
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
- WM - Majority; do pass AWRD 16 bill proposed by Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
+ − Amendments (2)
6605-S.E AMH ENVI H4571.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2016
6605-S AMS WARN S4696.2
ADOPTED 02/17/2016
+ − Sponsor
Warnick
Type:
Primary Sponsor