+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor