+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor