+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:30 PM.
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor