+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Local Government.
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (GOS 16).
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
+ − Amendments (2)
6525-S.E AMH LG H4516.2
ADOPTED 03/04/2016
6525-S AMS ANGE S4611.1
ADOPTED 02/16/2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor