+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 174, 2014 Laws.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Placed on second reading.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 14).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 9:00 AM.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Amendments (4)
6518-S2.E AMH HUDG PRIN 460
ADOPTED 03/12/2014
6518-S2.E AMH HUDG PRIN 459
ADOPTED 03/12/2014
6518-S2 AMS CHAS S4837.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2014
6518-S2 AMS BILL S4821.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor