+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRED 14).
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
- WM - Majority; do pass TRED 14 bill proposed by Trade & Economic Development.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 9:00 AM.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor