+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)