+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor