+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 2/10/2020*.
- Chapter 2, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Held on third reading.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor