+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)