+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 321, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HSEL - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor