+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Chapter 103, 2014 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM.
- APPE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- APPE - Executive action taken by committee.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education.
- ED - Majority; do pass.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 11:00 AM.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 14).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 5:30 PM.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendment
6431-S AMH APPE H4443.1
ADOPTED 03/06/2014